EP0595175 - Device for the supply of CVD-deposition-equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.1997 [1997/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55014 Mainz / DE | For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE 55014 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55014 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE D-55014 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bittner, Hans-Joachim Im Brühl 26 D-55218 Ingelheim / DE | 02 /
Klein, Hans-Jürgen Steinweg 36 D-37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | 03 /
Küpper, Thomas Kastanienweg 3 D-37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | 04 /
Mörsen, Ewald Otto Hahn-Strasse 11 D-64546 Mörfelden / DE | [1996/07] |
Former [1994/18] | 01 /
Bittner, Hans-Joachim Im Brühl 26 D-55218 Ingelheim / DE | ||
02 /
Klein, Hans-Jürgen Steinweg 36 D-37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | |||
03 /
Küpper, Thomas Kastanienweg 3 D-37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | |||
04 /
Mörsen, Ewald Otto-Hahn-Strasse 11 D-64546 Mörfelden / DE | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93116937.9 | 20.10.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | DE19924236324 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4236324 | [1994/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595175 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595175 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
C23C16/448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Versorgung von CVD-Beschichtungseinrichtungen | [1994/18] | English: | Device for the supply of CVD-deposition-equipment | [1994/18] | French: | Dispositif pour l'approvisionnement d'appareillages destinés au dépôt chimique en phase vapeur | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 15.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0018068 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C Sektion, Band 14, Nr. 578, 21. Dezember 1990 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 7 C 791 |