EP0595186 - Process for making multilayer paint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doebler, Klaus-Peter An der Hoffnung 19 D-42447 Radevormwald / DE | 02 /
Göldner, Wolfgang, Dr. Bayernstrasse 15 D-51491 Heiligenhaus / DE | 03 /
Kimpel, Matthias, Dr. Westfalendamm 6 D-58332 Schwelm / DE | 04 /
Klein, Klausjörg Richard-Strauss-Allee 33 D-42289 Wuppertal / DE | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Hrabal, Ulrich, et al Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Hrabal, Ulrich, Dr., et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1994/18] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat. Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117009.6 | 21.10.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | DE19924235778 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4235778 | [1994/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595186 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595186 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0595186 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/00, B05D1/36, C09D175/04 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
B05D7/542 (EP,US);
B05D1/36 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
B05D1/007 (EP,US);
B05D2451/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D175/04, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
B05D2451/00, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/20 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mehrschichtlackierungen | [1994/18] | English: | Process for making multilayer paint | [1994/18] | French: | Procédé pour l'élaboration de peintures multicouches | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1999
06.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Fitzner, Ulrich Fitzner & Frese PartGmbH Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1999
BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Fitzner, Ulrich, Dr. Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | 26.03.1999 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 01.04.1999 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 23.04.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.09.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.10.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.02.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.06.1998 | NL | 17.06.1998 | SE | 17.09.1998 | BE | 31.10.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | IT | 17.06.1998 | |
NL | 17.06.1998 | ||
SE | 17.09.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/23] | IT | 17.06.1998 | |
SE | 17.09.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 17.06.1998 | |
SE | 17.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | SE | 17.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4126476 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DPA]DE4125459 (HERBERTS GMBH [DE]) [DPA] 1* the whole document * | Opposition | DE3432233 | DE3447257 | EP0595356 |