EP0596335 - Hydraulic bicycle brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WILLI WÄLTE ELEKTRONIK INGENIEURBUREAU Schawalderhof 84 CH-9430 St. Margrethen / CH | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wälte, Willi Schawalderhof 84 CH-9430 St. Margrethen / CH | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 D-88131 Lindau/B. / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117021.1 | 21.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | DE19924237110 | 03.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4237110 | [1994/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596335 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62L3/02, B62L1/14 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
B62L1/14 (EP,US);
B62L3/023 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20287 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20438 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2045 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20462 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, PT [1994/19] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Bremse für Fahrräder | [1994/19] | English: | Hydraulic bicycle brake | [1994/19] | French: | Frein hydraulique pour bicyclettes | [1994/19] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 03.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE444476 (BARRERE) [A] 1 * page 3, line 33 - page 5, line 31; figure 3 *; | [A]FR2575991 (LELEU JEAN [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 7 - line 40; figures 3,4 * |