EP0596340 - Circuit with Reed-Solomon error correction and CRC error detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/19] | Error correction circuit | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kodama, Yukio, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Kitaitami Seisakusho, 1, Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Kazuo, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Kitaitami Seisakusho, 1, Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Hideo, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Joho Denshi Kenkyusho, 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Prüfer, Lutz H. PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117087.2 | 21.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | JP19920294853 | 04.11.1992 Original published format: JP 29485392 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0596340 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0596340 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596340 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
H03M13/091 (EP,US);
H03M13/1515 (EP,US);
H03M13/159 (EP,US);
H03M13/29 (EP,US);
H03M13/6575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/19] | Title | German: | Schaltung mit Reed-Solomon Fehlerkorrektur und CRC Fehlererkennung | [1998/37] | English: | Circuit with Reed-Solomon error correction and CRC error detection | [1998/37] | French: | Circuit de correction d'erreur Reed-Solomon avec détection d'erreurs par CRC | [1998/37] |
Former [1994/19] | Fehlerkorrekturschaltung | ||
Former [1994/19] | Error correction circuit | ||
Former [1994/19] | Circuit de correction d'erreur | Examination procedure | 20.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 04.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP98111910.0 / EP0880237 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0357461 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 7; figure - * [A] 2-11,13-15; | [A]EP0407101 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 51 - page 11, line 47; figure - *; | [A]EP0364172 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 7 - page 6, line 37; figure - *; | [A]JPS63255876 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890217), vol. 13, no. 70, Database accession no. (P - 829), & JP63255876 A 19881024 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |