EP0596342 - Ultrasonic measuring apparatus which minimizes the number of digital values treated by processing means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/19] | Measuring device with ultrasound waves minimising the number of digital measuring values | ||
[1994/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 2501 Bienne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 CH-2501 Bienne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mignot, Jean-Pierre Rue du Chasselas 13 CH-2034 Peseux / CH | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | de Montmollin, Henri, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | de Montmollin, Henri, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 93117112.8 | 22.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | FR19920013351 | 02.11.1992 Original published format: FR 9213351 | [1994/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596342 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596342 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/18, G01N29/10, A61B8/08 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
A61B8/0858 (EP,US);
G01N29/38 (EP,US);
G01S15/18 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02854 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | Ultraschallmessgerät mit Minimierung der Zahl der durch die Verarbeitungsmitteln verarbeiteten digitalen Daten | [1994/23] | English: | Ultrasonic measuring apparatus which minimizes the number of digital values treated by processing means | [1994/23] | French: | Appareil de mesure par ultrasons minimisant le nombre de valeurs numériques traitées par les moyens de traitement | [1994/19] |
Former [1994/19] | Ultraschallmessgerät mit Minimierung der Zahl der digitalen Daten | ||
Former [1994/19] | Measuring device with ultrasound waves minimising the number of digital measuring values | Examination procedure | 24.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.12.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4324141 (STEARN RICHARD J) [A] 1 * column 5, line 20 - line 48; figures 2-3 *; | [A]EP0324855 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1 * page 11, column 5, line 3 - page 12, line 12; figure 2 *; | [DA]EP0356629 (ASULAB SA [CH]) [DA] 1* column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 15; figure 3 * | [A] - M. ERIKSEN, "noninvasive measurement of arterial diameters in humans using ultrasound echoes with prefiltered waveforms.", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING, STEVENAGE GB, (198703), vol. 25, no. 2, page 189-194 [A] 1 |