EP0599067 - Transparent moulding matter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tiefensee, Kristin, Dr. Beethovenstrasse 1 D-67368 Westheim / DE | 02 /
Guentherberg, Norbert, Dr. Nachtigallenweg 44 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 03 /
Deckers, Andreas, Dr. Eschenbachstrasse 48 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1994/22] | Application number, filing date | 93117312.4 | 26.10.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | DE19924239436 | 24.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4239436 | [1994/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599067 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599067 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/12, C08L25/12, C08L51/04 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
C08L25/12 (EP);
C08L33/12 (EP);
C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L33/12, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/22] | Title | German: | Transparente Formmasse | [1994/22] | English: | Transparent moulding matter | [1994/22] | French: | Matière à mouler transparente | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 22.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0245547 ; | [A]DE2039022 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 5 - line 8 * * page 8, line 21 - line 31 * * example 1 ** claims 1-4,6,7 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 13, Database accession no. 90-094618, & JPH0245547 A 19900215 (MITSUBISHI RAYON) [A] 1 * abstract * |