EP0650740 - Interventional catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Opposition rejected | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider (Europe) GmbH Ackerstrasse 6 8180 Bülach / CH | [1998/22] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER (EUROPE) AG Ackerstrasse 6 CH-8180 Bülach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kastenhofer, Gerhard Im Gassacher 11 CH-8307 Effretikon / CH | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A. 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | ||
Former [1995/18] | Misrachi, Alfred Alfred MISRACHI, Ingénieur-conseil, Chemin de la Plantaz 15 CH-1024 Ecublens / CH | Application number, filing date | 93117403.1 | 27.10.1993 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0650740 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0650740 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
A61M25/1034 (EP,US);
A61M25/0045 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/18 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0047 (EP,US);
A61M25/0009 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (EP,US);
A61M25/1027 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/14] |
Former [1995/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Eingriffskatheter | [1995/18] | English: | Interventional catheter | [1995/18] | French: | Cathéter d'intervention | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1993 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 18.01.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, LU, MC, PT | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1997 | Observations by third parties | 13.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Public notification(s) | DECISION REJECTING THE OPPOSITION (ART. 102(2) EPC) OF 10.04.2002 TO OBSERVAMED PALMA S.L., CALLE SAN JAIME NO. 6., 07012 PALMA DE MALLORCA, ESPAGNE; | ObservaMed Palma S.L. Calle San Jaime No. 6 07012 Palma de Mallorca / ES | [2003/16] | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.2000
07.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE ObservaMed Palma S.L. Calle San Jaime No. 6 07012 Palma de Mallorca / ES | [2002/16] |
Former [2000/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.2000
07.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE ObservaMed Palma S.L. Calle San Jaime No. 6 07012 Palma de Mallorca / ES Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 10.08.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.01.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.03.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.05.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.07.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.12.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1994 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4323071 (SIMPSON JOHN B, et al) [DA] 1,3,6,7 * figures 1,4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0380102 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5041100 (ROWLAND STEPHEN M [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6-8 * column W *; | [DA]WO9211893 (KONTRON INSTR INC [US]) [DA] 1,2,4 * abstract * | Examination | US3561493 | US4211741 | US4335723 | EP0351687 | US4906244 | US5195969 | EP0436501 | EP0669142 | - Polymer Handbook 1975, JOHN WILEY | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science, JOHN WILEY , VOLUME 1 , 1985 | - OPTI-Plast from Vas-Cath Inc 1991 | other | US3561493 | US4211741 | US4335723 | EP0351687 | US4906244 | US5195969 | EP0436501 | EP0669142 |