EP0595309 - Element, fit to create a connection between uprights and beams for the composition of modular reticular structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fontana, Renato Via Paradiso 174 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | [1994/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Bonini, Ercole c/o STUDIO ING. E. BONINI SRL Corso Fogazzaro 8 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 93117455.1 | 28.10.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | IT1992VI00166 | 30.10.1992 Original published format: IT VI920166 | [1994/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0595309 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0595309 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/14, A47B57/40, A47B47/02 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
A47B47/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | Passen des Element zur Herstellung einer Verbindung zwischen Pfosten und Trägern zum Zusammenbauen modularer, netzförmiger Strukturen | [1994/18] | English: | Element, fit to create a connection between uprights and beams for the composition of modular reticular structures | [1994/18] | French: | Elément apte à créer une liaison entre des montants et des poutres pour composer des structures modulaires en réseau | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 24.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3342347 (CHRISTOPHER BEREND PAUL) [Y] 1,3 * column 2, paragraph 4; figures 2,3,5 * * column 3, paragraph 7 *; | [A]GB1189833 (G K N SANKEY PROPRIETARY LTD [ZA]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2519243 (SIMON ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1* figures 6,8,10 *; | [Y]EP0398014 (LAMPERTZ FAB ORG [DE]) [Y] 1,3 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - line 49 * | by applicant | US3342347 | FR2519243 | EP0398014 |