EP0598258 - Voltage controlled oscillator operating with digital controlled loads in a phase lock loop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CODEX CORPORATION 20 Cabot Boulevard Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states CODEX CORPORATION 20 Cabot Boulevard Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atriss, Ahmad H. 3310 N Desoto Chandler, Arizona 85224 / US | 02 /
Peterson, Benjamin C. 8604 S Oak Street Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | 03 /
Parker, Lanny L. 1264 W Los Lagos Mesa, Arizona 85202 / US | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93117456.9 | 28.10.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | US19920978538 | 19.11.1992 Original published format: US 978538 | [1994/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598258 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598258 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/099, H03L7/08 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
H03K3/0315 (EP);
H03K3/354 (EP);
H03L7/08 (EP);
H03L7/0995 (EP);
H03L7/191 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/21] | Title | German: | Mit digital gesteuerter Last arbeitender spannungsgesteuerter Oszillator in einem Phasenregelkreis | [1994/21] | English: | Voltage controlled oscillator operating with digital controlled loads in a phase lock loop | [1994/21] | French: | Oscillateur commandé en tension, fonctionnant avec une charge contrôlée numériquement, dans une boucle d'asservissement de phase | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.04.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/03] | FR | 19.09.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0346664 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 54; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4982195 (OLIVENBAUM JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 55; figure 2 *; | [A]US4902986 (LESMEISTER GARY J [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]GB2253750 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]); | [A]US5036216 (HOHMANN JERE W [US], et al) |