05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
30.07.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
05.12.2003 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
26.11.2003 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
03.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
26.06.2003 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
28.02.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
17.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
27.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
26.07.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
14.03.2001 |
Change - appeal |
|
15.02.2001 |
Change - appeal |
|
27.12.2000 |
Change - appeal |
|
13.12.2000 |
Change - appeal number |
|
24.11.2000 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |
17.11.2000 |
Change - appeal number |
|
14.11.2000 |
Change - appeal |
|
05.09.2000 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
05.09.2000 |
Opposition rejected |
|
10.03.2000 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
11.02.2000 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] |
04.02.2000 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
30.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
14.09.1999 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
11.05.1999 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
06.04.1999 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
08.02.1999 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
15.01.1999 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] |
11.01.1999 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
22.09.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
28.08.1998 |
Opposition filed |
published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] |
25.08.1998 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
21.08.1998 |
Opposition filed |
published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] |
20.08.1998 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
27.02.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] |
21.11.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
24.10.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |
03.10.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] |
19.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.05.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.09.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.03.1996 |
First examination report |
|
29.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.03.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.05.1994 [1994/20] |
31.03.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.05.1994 [1994/20] |