EP0597331 - A garment for absorbing human discharge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states Kimberley-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Gompel, Paul Theodore Route 1, Box 221, School Rd Hortonville, WI 54944 / US | 02 /
Surprise, Jody Dorothy 113 Harrison St. Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 03 /
Schleinz, Robert Joseph 102 Praire Court Appleton, WI 54915 / US | 04 /
Boland, Leona Gertrude 3246 Fondotto Drive Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 05 /
Zehner, Georgia Lynn 4316 County Trunk T. Larsen WI 54957 / US | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1994/20] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117507.9 | 16.12.1988 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | US19870133674 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: US 133674 | US19870133758 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: US 133758 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597331 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597331 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44, A61F13/15, A41B13/04 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
A61F13/496 (EP);
A41B9/02 (KR);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/15593 (EP);
A61F13/49009 (EP);
A61F13/49015 (EP);
A61F13/511 (EP);
A61F5/4401 (EP);
A61F13/49011 (EP);
A61F13/491 (EP);
A61F13/5148 (EP);
A61F2013/15365 (EP);
A61F2013/15861 (EP);
A61F2013/15934 (EP);
A61F2013/49049 (EP);
A61F2013/51409 (EP);
A61F2013/51411 (EP);
A61F2013/51429 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | Kleidung zum Absorbieren menschlicher Ausscheidung | [1994/20] | English: | A garment for absorbing human discharge | [1994/20] | French: | Vêtement pour l'absorption de décharge humaine | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88121163.5 / EP0320991 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hyltner, Jan-Olof Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | 02
19.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hyltner, Jan-Olof Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
02
19.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | |||
Former [2000/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE SCA Mölnlycke AB 40503 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hyltner, Jan-Olof Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
02
19.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | |||
Former [1999/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE SCA Mölnlycke AB 40503 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hyltner, Jan-Olof AB Dahls Patentbyra, Box 606 182 16 Danderyd / SE | ||
02
19.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | |||
Former [1998/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE SCA Mölnlycke AB 40503 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hyltner, Jan-Olof Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
02
19.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | |||
Former [1998/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1998
21.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE SCA Mölnlycke AB 40503 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hyltner, Jan-Olof Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | 25.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.08.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.08.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.09.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.09.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 25.09.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/04] | Appeal following opposition | 07.11.2000 | Appeal received No. T1106/00 | 21.12.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.09.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 25.09.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.10.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 19.11.1997 | LU | 16.12.1997 | AT | 16.12.2001 | SE | 17.12.2001 | BE | 31.12.2001 | CH | 31.12.2001 | LI | 31.12.2001 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/16] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
AT | 16.12.2001 | ||
SE | 17.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/10] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
AT | 16.12.2001 | ||
SE | 17.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
SE | 17.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
SE | 17.12.2001 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 19.11.1997 | |
LU | 31.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2141105 (ELLER JOHN A, et al); | [AD]GB1520740 (COURTAULDS LTD); | [A]US4437860 (SIGL WAYNE C [US], et al); | [A]US4486192 (SIGL WAYNE C [US]); | [A]US4655760 (MORMAN MICHAEL T [US], et al) |