EP0596424 - Process of 4-isopropylbenzylsalicilate as cutaneous anti-lipoperoxidant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rialdi, Giorgio 18, Via Semeria I-16131 Genova / IT | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Attilio, et al Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Porsia, Attilio, Dr., et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 I-16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 93117581.4 | 29.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | IT1992GE00115 | 04.11.1992 Original published format: IT GE920115 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596424 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596424 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K2800/522 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LU, NL, PT [1994/19] | Title | German: | Verwendung des 4-Isopropylbenzylsalicylats als Haut-Antilipidperoxyden | [1994/19] | English: | Process of 4-isopropylbenzylsalicilate as cutaneous anti-lipoperoxidant | [1994/19] | French: | Utilisation du salicylate de 4-isopropylbenzyle en tant qu'antilipoperoxydant cutané | [1994/19] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 08.01.1997 | ES | 08.01.1997 | NL | 08.01.1997 | PT | 08.04.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | DK | 08.01.1997 | |
ES | 08.01.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 08.01.1997 | |
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | PT | 08.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "Megasol complex. Sunscreen for a natural and complete UV-A and UV-B protection", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19851104), vol. 103, no. 18, Database accession no. 146954f [X] 2 * abstract * | [ ] - RELATA TECHNICA, (1984), vol. 16, pages 49 - 96 |