EP0595346 - Composite microwave module assembly and its connection structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosugi, Yuhei, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Osamu, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Izumi, Hiroaki, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kusamitsu, Hideki, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Omagari, Shin-ichi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Watanabe, Hideo, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Minowa, Yoshio, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/18] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117582.2 | 29.10.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | JP19920291005 | 29.10.1992 Original published format: JP 29100592 | JP19920291031 | 29.10.1992 Original published format: JP 29103192 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595346 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595346 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/00, H01P5/107 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
H01P1/00 (EP,US);
H01L23/552 (EP,US);
H01P5/107 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49111 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01068 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1423 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1517 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16195 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/18] | Title | German: | Modulare Mikrowellen-Anordnungseinheit und ihre Verbindungsstruktur | [1998/29] | English: | Composite microwave module assembly and its connection structure | [1994/18] | French: | Assemblage modulaire composite hyperfréquence et sa structure de connexion | [1994/18] |
Former [1994/18] | Modulare Mikrowellen-Anordnungseinheit und seine Verbindungsstruktur | Examination procedure | 21.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Request for further processing for: | 02.10.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3483489 (DIETRICH NORMAN R) [A] 12-14* column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2284195 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,3,8 * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 20; figures 1,2A,2B *; | [A]EP0408228 (OXLEY DEV CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0503200 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3 * column 5, line 58 - column 7, line 54; figures 1-3,7,8 *; | [A]US5151769 (IMMORLICA JR ANTHONY A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W * | [A] - R.A. PUCEL, "Design considerations for monolithic microwave circuits", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, NEW YORK US, (198106), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 513 - 534 [A] 2 * figures 34,35 * |