Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0595346
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
12.11.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
20.11.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] |
10.11.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.05.1998 |
Change - German title |
published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] |
25.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.11.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
12.10.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
09.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.10.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
19.07.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
27.04.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.01.1996 |
First examination report |
|
17.03.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] |
17.03.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] |