Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06232608 | Global Dossier | 19.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26921793 | 27.10.1993 | JP29103192 | 29.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06140090 | Global Dossier | 20.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29100592 | 29.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU674699B | Global Dossier | 09.01.1997 | B2 | AU5037193 | 12.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29100592 | 29.10.1992 | JP29103192 | 29.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0595346 | Global Dossier | 07.01.1999 | B1 | EP0595346 | 04.05.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP29100592 | 29.10.1992 | JP29103192 | 29.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2109441 | 13.05.1997 | C | CA2109441 | 30.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP29100592 | 29.10.1992 | JP29103192 | 29.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1089396 | 13.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29100592 | 29.10.1992 | JP29103192 | 29.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69322930T | 17.06.1999 | T2 | DE69322930D1 | 18.02.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP29100592 | 29.10.1992 | JP29103192 | 29.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5450046 | 12.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29100592 | 29.10.1992 | JP29103192 | 29.10.1992 |