EP0596427 - Lamp-holder for vehicle headlights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI S.p.A. Via Griziotti 4 20145 Milano / IT | [1998/19] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI S.p.A. Via Griziotti 4 I-20145 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states CARELLO S.p.A. Corso Unione Sovietica, 600 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valente, Franco Via Mentana, 15 I-10100 Torino / IT | 02 /
Mantello, Maurizio Via Isonzo, 61 I-10100 Torino / IT | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al c/o Studio Torta, Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 93117596.2 | 29.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | IT1992TO00896 | 03.11.1992 Original published format: IT TO920896 | [1994/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596427 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596427 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F21M7/00 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
F21S41/194 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1994/19] | Title | German: | Lampenhalter für Kraftfahrzeug-Scheinwerfer | [1994/19] | English: | Lamp-holder for vehicle headlights | [1994/19] | French: | Porte-lampe pour projecteur d'automobile | [1994/19] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1994 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 21.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2050587 (SEV MARCHAL) [A] 1 * page 2, line 9 - page 4, line 6 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2122103 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1 * page 4, line 12 - line 23 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 14 * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 3 ** figure 1 *; | [A]FR2670271 (CARELLO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |