EP0598267 - Television receiver with a switching power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132 75175 Pforzheim / DE | [1998/10] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132 D-75175 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenthal, Hans-Dietrich Swinemünder Strasse 13 D-33803 Steinhagen / DE | [1994/21] | Application number, filing date | 93117638.2 | 30.10.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | DE19924237634 | 07.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4237634 | [1994/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0598267 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0598267 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598267 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/63 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
H04N5/63 (EP);
H02M7/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/21] | Title | German: | Videoempfänger mit einem Schaltnetzteil | [1994/21] | English: | Television receiver with a switching power supply | [1994/21] | French: | Récepteur de télévision muni d'une alimentation à découpage | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0167737 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 17; figures 1,4 *; | [YA]EP0436515 (RCA LICENSING CORP [US]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 13 * * column 3, line 46 - line 51; figures 1,3 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 56 * [A] 2,3; | [A]EP0477399 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2* column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 14; figure 1 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "SWITCH-MODE POWER SUPPLIES", ELECTOR ELECTRONICS, LONDON (GB), (198710), vol. 13, no. 149, pages 49 - 53 [A] 1,3 * figure 7 * |