EP0597343 - Warning triangle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBRA GMBH & CO. GEBR. RADERSCHAD KG Wehrstrasse 151 53773 Hennef / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states GEBRA GMBH & CO. GEBR. RADERSCHAD KG Wehrstrasse 151 D-53773 Hennef / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raderschad, Peter Am Wahlberg 15 D-53773 Hennef / DE | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Fechner, Joachim Im Broeltal 118 53773 Hennef / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Fechner, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Im Broeltal 118 D-53773 Hennef / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117640.8 | 30.10.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | DE19924238180 | 12.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4238180 | [1994/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0597343 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0597343 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597343 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q7/00 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
B60Q7/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | Warndreieck | [1994/20] | English: | Warning triangle | [1994/20] | French: | Triangle de signalisation | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.08.1997 | PT | 12.11.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/24] | PT | 12.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE9214680U (FRIELINGSDORF) [XP] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4019063 (MERCEDES BENZ AG) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US3908581 (ZEIZEL) [A] 1,2 * column A; figures 5,7 *; | [A]FR2203559 (DOMINION AUTO ACCESSOIRES LIMITED) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |