EP0620994 - Adjustable settee/armchair cover with gathering on arms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VINCENZO ZUCCHI S.P.A. Via Tiziano 9/A I-20145 Milano / IT | [1994/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zucchi, Maurizio Via Telesio, 18 I-20145 Milano / IT | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Zavattoni, Maria Chiara, et al Racheli & C. s.r.l., Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Zavattoni Gusmeroli, Maria Chiara, et al Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. s.r.l., Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 I-20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93117701.8 | 02.11.1993 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI00317U | 20.04.1993 Original published format: IT MI930317 U | [1994/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0620994 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A47C31/10 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
A47C31/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT [1994/43] | Title | German: | Verstellbarer Sofa-/Sesselüberzug mit Falten auf den Armlehnen | [1994/43] | English: | Adjustable settee/armchair cover with gathering on arms | [1994/43] | French: | Housse réglable pour canapé/fauteuil avec des froncer sur ler accoudoirs | [1994/43] | File destroyed: | 12.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/06] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE9215149U (VINCENZO ZUCCI S.P.A.) [X] 1,4 * page 4, line 28 - page 6, line 14; figures 3-6 * [Y] 2,3; | [PY]FR2690322 (MANIFATTURA CASTIGLIONI S.P.A.) [PY] 2,3 * abstract * |