EP0597360 - Substituted N-phenyl-triazolin (thi)ones, processes and intermediates for their production and their use as herbicides, insecticides and acaricides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2001/42] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haas, Wilhelm, Dr. Schürgespfad 19 D-50259 Pulheim / DE | 02 /
Findeisen, Kurt, Prof.Dr. Dünfelder Strasse 28 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Linker, Karl-Heinz Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 3 D-51377 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Schallner, Otto, Dr. Noldeweg 22 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
König, Klaus, Dr. Zum Hahnenberg 40 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | 06 /
Marhold, Albrecht, Dr. Carl-Duisberg-Strasse 329 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | 07 /
Santel, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Grünstrasse 9a D-51371 Leverkusen / DE | 08 /
Dollinger, Markus, Dr. Hüschelrath 7 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 09 /
Wachendorff-Neumann, Ulrike Krischerstrasse 81 D-40789 Monheim / DE | [1994/20] | Application number, filing date | 93117748.9 | 02.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | DE19924238125 | 12.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4238125 | [1994/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597360 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597360 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/12, C07D405/12, C07D401/12, C07F7/08, C07C255/50, A01N43/653 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D249/08 (KR);
A01N43/653 (EP);
C07C255/50 (EP);
C07D249/12 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/20] | Title | German: | Substituierte N-Phenyl-Triazolin(thi)one, Verfahren sowie neue Zwischenprodukte zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Herbizide, Insektizide und Akarizide | [1994/20] | English: | Substituted N-phenyl-triazolin (thi)ones, processes and intermediates for their production and their use as herbicides, insecticides and acaricides | [1994/20] | French: | N-phényle-triazolin (thi)ones substitués, procédés et produits intermédiaires pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme herbicides, insecticides et acaricides | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9103470 (FMC CORP [US]); | [X]US4818275 (THEODORIDIS GEORGE [US]); | [XD]EP0370332 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]US4846875 (CHANG JUN H [US]); | [Y]US4705557 (MARAVETZ LESTER L [US]); | [Y]US4702763 (MARAVETZ LESTER L [US]); | [X]EP0422469 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XD]EP0441004 (ENICHEM SINTESI [IT]); | [AD]EP0431373 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 23, 10. Juni 1985, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 204066k, PANDEY O P ET AL. 'Mono(cyclopentadienyl)titanium(IV) derivatives with heterocyclic thiones' Seite 609 ;Spalte 1 ; | Examination | - KUMAI S. ET AL., "Preparation of 2,4,5-trifluorobenzoic acid from trichlorobenzonitrile. & JP-A-04 321 644 (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.)", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930426), vol. 111, no. 17, Database accession no. 168823Z, page 850, column 2 |