EP0597369 - New phosphazene derivatives and use of same as stabilizers for oils and greases based on perfluoropolyethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUSIMONT S.p.A. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20100 Milano / IT | [1994/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paolo, Odello, c/o TAZZETTI GUIDO Strada di Settimo 266 I-10156 Torino / IT | 02 /
Navarrini, Walter Via Aldo Moro 46/48 I-20010 Boffalora Ticino (Milan) / IT | 03 /
Dickinson, Chambers Richard c/o University of Durham, South Road Durham DH1 3LE / GB | 04 /
Costante, Corti Via Chopin 1 I-20141 Milan / IT | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Simeoni, Lucio, et al Sama Patents Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Simeoni, Lucio, Dr., et al Sama Patents, Via Masera, 10 (P.zza Lima) I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93117770.3 | 03.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI02569 | 10.11.1992 Original published format: IT MI922569 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597369 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597369 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6581, C10M169/04, C07F9/06, C08G79/02, // (C10M169/04, 107:38, 137:16) | [1994/20] | CPC: |
C08G79/025 (EP,US);
C07F9/65812 (EP,KR,US);
C07F9/65815 (EP,US);
C10M107/38 (EP,KR,US);
C10M119/22 (EP,US);
C10M137/16 (EP,KR,US);
C10M169/00 (EP,US);
C10M169/04 (EP,US);
C10M2211/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/00 (EP,US);
C10M2213/02 (EP,US);
C10M2213/023 (EP,US);
C10M2213/04 (EP,US);
C10M2213/043 (EP,US);
C10M2213/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/0606 (EP,US);
C10M2213/062 (EP,US);
C10M2213/0623 (EP,US);
C10M2223/02 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US);
C10M2223/08 (EP,US);
C10N2050/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | Neue Phosphazen-Derivate und deren Verwendung zur Stabilisierung von Ölen und Fetten auf Basis von Perfluoropolyethern | [1994/20] | English: | New phosphazene derivatives and use of same as stabilizers for oils and greases based on perfluoropolyethers | [1994/20] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés du phosphazène et leur utilisation comme stabilisants d'huiles et de graisses à base de perfluoropolyéthers | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.1998 | BE | 16.09.1998 | CH | 16.09.1998 | ES | 16.09.1998 | GR | 16.09.1998 | LI | 16.09.1998 | LU | 03.11.1998 | IE | 16.11.1998 | SE | 16.12.1998 | PT | 18.12.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 16.09.1998 | |
BE | 16.09.1998 | ||
CH | 16.09.1998 | ||
ES | 16.09.1998 | ||
GR | 16.09.1998 | ||
LI | 16.09.1998 | ||
IE | 16.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
SE | 16.12.1998 | ||
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 16.09.1998 | |
BE | 16.09.1998 | ||
CH | 16.09.1998 | ||
GR | 16.09.1998 | ||
LI | 16.09.1998 | ||
IE | 16.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
SE | 16.12.1998 | ||
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 16.09.1998 | |
BE | 16.09.1998 | ||
CH | 16.09.1998 | ||
LI | 16.09.1998 | ||
IE | 16.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
SE | 16.12.1998 | ||
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 16.09.1998 | |
BE | 16.09.1998 | ||
IE | 16.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
SE | 16.12.1998 | ||
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
CH | 21.12.1998 | ||
LI | 21.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 16.09.1998 | |
BE | 16.09.1998 | ||
IE | 16.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
SE | 16.12.1998 | ||
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 16.09.1998 | |
BE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
SE | 16.12.1998 | ||
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 16.09.1998 | |
BE | 16.09.1998 | ||
SE | 16.12.1998 | ||
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 16.09.1998 | |
SE | 16.12.1998 | ||
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | BE | 16.09.1998 | |
PT | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 16.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4194983 (ITO THOMAS I [US], et al) [A] 1,10-14 * column W *; | [A]EP0145002 (BORG WARNER CHEMICALS INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0204144 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,10-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0287892 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,10-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4864047 (BEZOARI MASSIMO D [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [DA]EP0421747 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DA] 1,10-14 * the whole document * |