Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0596506
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.12.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] |
13.12.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] |
05.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.11.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.02.1995 |
First examination report |
|
25.03.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] |
25.03.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] |