EP0597393 - Process for cleaning harmful gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN PIONICS CO., LTD. Tokyo Sakurada Bldg. 8F., 1-3, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states JAPAN PIONICS CO., LTD. Tokyo Sakurada Bldg. 8F., 1-3, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Keiichi, c/o Japan Pionics Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory, 5181, Tamura Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hatakeyama, Toshiya, c/o Japan Pionics Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory, 5181, Tamura Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117937.8 | 05.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | JP19920298806 | 09.11.1992 Original published format: JP 29880692 | JP19920325572 | 04.12.1992 Original published format: JP 32557292 | JP19920332948 | 14.12.1992 Original published format: JP 33294892 | JP19920332949 | 14.12.1992 Original published format: JP 33294992 | JP19920355408 | 21.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35540892 | JP19920355409 | 21.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35540992 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597393 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597393 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34, B01D53/68, A62D3/00 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B01D53/8659 (EP,US);
B01D53/38 (KR);
B01D53/68 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/20] | B01D53/34, B01D53/36, A62D3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Schadgas | [1994/20] | English: | Process for cleaning harmful gas | [1994/20] | French: | Procédé pour la purification de gaz nocif | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04149010 ; | [A]US4339309 (PRUETT DAVID J, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0365490 (GETTERS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-6 * claim - *; | [A]EP0384802 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP0431351 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920909), vol. 16, no. 431, Database accession no. (C - 983), & JP04149010 A 19920522 (JAPAN PIONICS) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |