Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0643383 | Global Dossier | 01.04.1998 | B1 | EP0643383 | 02.08.1995 | A3 | EP0643383 | 15.03.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12219793 | 15.09.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69317778T | 30.07.1998 | T2 | DE69317778D1 | 07.05.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US12219793 | 15.09.1993 |