EP0598313 - Method and apparatus for binding textile surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH + CO. Kannegiesserring 32602 Vlotho / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH + CO. Kannegiesserring D-32602 Vlotho / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jürgen, Inselmann Angerweg 4 D-32584 Löhne / DE | 02 /
Albrecht, Kaiser Heide 8 D-32602 Vlotho / DE | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Möller, Friedrich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Möller, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118152.3 | 09.11.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | DE19924237722 | 09.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4237722 | [1994/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598313 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598313 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D06M10/02, D06M17/00, A41D27/06, B32B31/12 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
B32B38/0008 (EP,US);
A41D27/06 (EP);
A41H43/04 (EP);
B32B37/10 (EP);
B32B5/24 (EP,US);
D06M10/025 (EP);
D06M17/00 (EP);
B32B2310/00 (EP,US);
B32B2437/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden textiler Flächengebilde | [1994/21] | English: | Method and apparatus for binding textile surfaces | [1994/21] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour lier des surfaces textiles | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 06.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1999/25] | GB | 13.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0192510 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0177364 (HIRAOKA & CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]DE3312432 (SANDO IRON WORKS CO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS6065183 ; | [A]GB2134447 (KANNEGIESSER MARTIN); | [D]DE3303504 (KANNEGIESSER H GMBH CO [DE]); | [A]EP0362059 (PICARDIE LAINIERE [FR]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 21, Database accession no. 85-126301, & JPS6065183 A 19850413 (UNITIKA) [A] 1 * abstract * |