EP0600314 - Organic polyisocyanates having at least partially blocked isocyanate groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
König, Eberhard, Dr. Arthur-Hantzsch-Strasse 50 D-51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
Casselmann, Holger, Dr. Töpferweg 36 D-51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
Kobelka, Frank Burscheider Strasse 146 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Foster, Keith-Allen, Dr. c/o Miles Inc. Patent Dept., Mobay Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15205-9741 / US | [1994/24] |
Former [1994/23] | 01 /
König, Eberhard, Dr. Arthur-Hantzsch-Strasse 50 D-51061 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
Casselmann, Holger, Dr. Töpferweg 36 D-51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
03 /
Kobelka, Frank Burscheider Strasse 146 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | |||
04 /
Foster, Keith-Allen, Dr. c/o Miles Inc. P.O. Box 40 Elkhart, Indiana 46515 / US | Application number, filing date | 93118592.0 | 18.11.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | DE19924240480 | 02.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4240480 | [1994/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600314 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0600314 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/80, C08G18/10, C07C275/00, C07D249/08, C09D175/04 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
C08G18/8096 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/808 (EP,KR,US);
C09D175/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/2805 (EP,US);
C08G18/10, C08G18/2865 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | 0rganische Polyisocyanate mit zumindest teilweise blockierten Isocyanatgruppen | [1994/23] | English: | Organic polyisocyanates having at least partially blocked isocyanate groups | [1994/23] | French: | Polyisocyanates organiques à groupes isocyanates au moins partiellement bloqués | [1994/23] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0096210 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 * * page 5, line 22 - line 29 ** example 3 *; | [A]EP0249884 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-9 * * page 5, line 1 - line 29 *; | [DA]EP0403044 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV [NL]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-9 * * page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 8 * * page 4, line 37 - line 40 * |