blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0603553

EP0603553 - Method for calibrating a pressure relief valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.1995
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.1995Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.1995 [1995/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/35]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1994/26]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Maisch, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing.
Elbinger Weg 4
D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE
02 / Mergenthaler, Robert, Ing.
Auf Hart 50
D-71706 Markgroeningen / DE
[1994/26]
Application number, filing date93118709.022.11.1993
[1994/26]
Priority number, dateDE1992424344622.12.1992         Original published format: DE 4243446
[1994/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0603553
Date:29.06.1994
Language:DE
[1994/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.1994
ClassificationIPC:F16K51/00, F16K37/00
[1994/26]
CPC:
F16K17/06 (EP); B60T8/341 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Einstellen eines Druckbegrenzungsventils[1994/26]
English:Method for calibrating a pressure relief valve[1994/26]
French:Méthode de calibrage d'une soupape de décharge de pression[1994/26]
File destroyed:13.08.2001
Examination procedure30.12.1994Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1995/37]
18.04.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1995/37]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DD115379  (KITZIG ET AL.) [A] 1 * insgesamt *;
 [A]FR2524603  (FRAMATOME & CIE) [A] 1 * Seite 3, Zeile 4 - Seite 4, Zeile 29; Figuren 1, 2 *;
 [A]DE3426018  (GAT GRUBENAUSBAU GMBH) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung; Seite 9, Zeile 5 - Seite 10, Zeile 34; Seite 12, Zeilen 3 - 31; Figuren 1, 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.