EP0601369 - Adjustable dielectric resonator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 D-71522 Backnang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberg, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Albrecht-Bengel-Strasse 1 D-71546 Aspach / DE | 02 /
Beis, Konstantin, Dipl.-Ing. Murrhardter Strasse 5 D-71522 Backnang / DE | 03 /
Knipp, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Lichtenbergweg 8 D-71546 Aspach / DE | [1994/24] | Application number, filing date | 93118715.7 | 22.11.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | DE19924241027 | 05.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4241027 | [1994/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601369 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01P7/10 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
H01P7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/24] | Title | German: | Abstimmbarer dielektrischer Resonator | [1994/24] | English: | Adjustable dielectric resonator | [1994/24] | French: | Résonateur diélectrique réglable | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/38] | 27.04.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS55141803 ; | [Y]FR2534088 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO LTD) [Y] 3 * page 31, line 17 - line 34 * * page 33, line 25 - page 34, line 2; figures 35-37,40 *; | [APA]JP4296104 ; | [A]US4667172 (LONGSHORE ET AL.) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 3 - line 8 * * column 5, line 33 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]US4810984 (ARNOLD ET AL.) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 60 - line 64; figure 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810123), vol. 5, no. 11, Database accession no. (E - 42)<683> , & JP55141803 A 19801106 (FUJITSU K.K.) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3 | [AP] - JP-A-4 296 104 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) 20. Oktober 1992, & JP4296104 A 00000000 [A] 1-3 * & PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol.17, no.115 (E-1330) 10. März 1993 * *Zusammenfassung* [PA] 1-3 |