EP0599249 - Switching network having improved synthesizer routing architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curello, Charles 21325 Ladeene Avenue Torrance, CA 90503 / US | 02 /
Shahriary, I. Mark 837 Euclid Street Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | 03 /
Berman, Arnold L. 714 Claymont Drive Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Witte, Alexander, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118765.2 | 22.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | US19920979952 | 23.11.1992 Original published format: US 979952 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0599249 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0599249 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/204 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
H04B7/2045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/22] | Title | German: | Schaltungsnetz mit verbesserten Wegsuchaufbau und Synthesator | [1994/22] | English: | Switching network having improved synthesizer routing architecture | [1994/22] | French: | Réseau de commutation ayant une architecture de routage et un synthétiseur améliorés | [1994/22] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 20.09.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4858225 (DESANTIS PIETRO [US]) [A] 1* column 14, line 62 - column 15, line 35; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0472018 (INT TELECOMM SATELLITE [US]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 11 - column 11, line 19; figure 5 * |