EP0599292 - Connector housing comprising a polybutylene terephthalate resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Tetsuo, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1, Nunohikihara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Kanda, Masahiro, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1, Nunohikihara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118929.4 | 24.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | JP19920313447 | 24.11.1992 Original published format: JP 31344792 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599292 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599292 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
H01B3/422 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L25/12 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
H01R13/46 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/22] | Title | German: | Verbindergehäuse aus einer Polybutylenterephthalat enthaltenden Zusammensetzung | [1994/22] | English: | Connector housing comprising a polybutylene terephthalate resin composition | [1994/22] | French: | Boîtier de connecteur comprenant une composition de résine de polybutylène téréphtalate | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6281444 ; | [A]EP0292251 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1,5,13,14,26-28 *; | [A]EP0388231 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* claims 1,12,17,19,22,24 *; | [A]EP0397456 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * page 11, line 6 - line 30; claims 1,2,10 *; | [A]US5162412 (LIU PING Y [US]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1,6,7 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 20, Database accession no. 87-141002, & JPS6281444 A 19870414 (TOYOBO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |