EP0588383 - Mechanical/electrical displacement transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SARCOS GROUP 261 East 300 South, Suite 150 Salt Lake City Utah 84111 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states SARCOS GROUP 261 East 300 South, Suite 150 Salt Lake City, Utah 84111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobsen, Stephen C. 274 South 12th East Salt Lake City, Utah 84102 / US | 02 /
Mladejovsky, Michael G. 551 E. 4080 So., 6L Salt Lake City, Utah 84107 / US | 03 /
Wood, John Everett P.O. Box 58642 Salt Lake City, Utah 84158 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119132.4 | 04.10.1990 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | US19890417181 | 04.10.1989 Original published format: US 417181 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0588383 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0588383 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588383 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/18 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
G01D5/14 (EP,US);
G01B7/003 (EP,US);
G01D5/34 (EP,US);
G01L1/005 (EP,US);
G01P15/093 (EP,US);
G01P15/12 (EP,US);
G01P15/124 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/12] | G01D5/14, G01B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | Mechanisch-elektrischer Wandler zur Messung einer Verschiebung | [1994/12] | English: | Mechanical/electrical displacement transducer | [1994/12] | French: | Transducteur mécanique-électrique de mesure de déplacement | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 15.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90119002.5 / EP0421401 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.1998 | ES | 21.01.1998 | GR | 21.01.1998 | IT | 21.01.1998 | NL | 21.01.1998 | DK | 21.04.1998 | SE | 21.04.1998 | GB | 04.10.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 21.01.1998 | |
ES | 21.01.1998 | ||
GR | 21.01.1998 | ||
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
NL | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
GB | 04.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 21.01.1998 | |
ES | 21.01.1998 | ||
GR | 21.01.1998 | ||
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
GB | 04.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 21.01.1998 | |
GR | 21.01.1998 | ||
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
GB | 04.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/03] | AT | 21.01.1998 | |
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
GB | 04.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.01.1998 | |
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 21.01.1998 | |
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 21.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2163260 (BOGE GMBH) [X] 1 * page 2, line 69 - line 110 *; | [DXA]US4767973 (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al) [DX] 1 * column 16, line 3 - line 14 * * column 16, line 24 - line 26; figure 7 * * column 16, line 41 - line 43; figure 7 * * column 16, line 67 - column 17, line 3 * * column 17, line 43 - column 18, line 2; figure 10 * * claims 1,35 *[A] 2-5 |