EP0596540 - Rate-responsive pacemaker with automatic mode switching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/19] | Rate-responsive pacemaker with automatic mode switching and/or variable hysteresis rate | ||
[1998/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | [1999/14] |
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | |||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | |||
Former [1994/19] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mann, Brian M. 14140 Beresford Road Beverly Hills, CA. 90210 / US | 02 /
Sholder, Jason A. 21037 Cantara Street Canoga Park, CA 91304 / US | 03 /
Florio, Joseph J. 10805 Wicks Street Sunland, CA 91040 / US | [1994/32] |
Former [1994/19] | 01 /
Mann, Brian M. 10625 Levico Way Los Angeles, CA 90077 / US | ||
02 /
Sholder, Jason A. 21037 Cantara Street Canoga Park, CA 91304 / US | |||
03 /
Florio, Joseph J. 10805 Wicks Street Sunland, CA 91040 / US | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | ||
Former [1995/04] | Rees, David Christopher Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93119216.5 | 04.10.1988 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | US19870107063 | 08.10.1987 Original published format: US 107063 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596540 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596540 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/368, A61N1/365 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
A61N1/3622 (EP,US);
A61N1/365 (EP,US);
A61N1/36514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | Die Stimulationsfrequenz anpassender Schrittmacher mit automatischer Betriebsartumschaltung | [1998/35] | English: | Rate-responsive pacemaker with automatic mode switching | [1998/35] | French: | Stimulateur cardiaque avec variation avec la fréquence avec commutation automatique de la mode | [1998/35] |
Former [1994/19] | Frequenzabhängiger Schrittmacher mit automatischer Betriebsartumschaltung und/oder variabler Hysteresefrequenz | ||
Former [1994/19] | Rate-responsive pacemaker with automatic mode switching and/or variable hysteresis rate | ||
Former [1994/19] | Stimulateur cardiaque avec variation avec la fréquence avec commutation automatique de la mode et/ou avec hystérèse de fréquence variable | Examination procedure | 08.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 27.06.1994 | New documents discovered [1994/33] | 10.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88116407.3 / EP0313881 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 07.04.1999 | GB | 04.10.1999 | [2002/23] |
Former [2001/09] | GB | 04.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0238966 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2 | Examination | US4429697 | US4686987 | US4802483 |