EP0600440 - Method and apparatus for cleaning flue gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foster Wheeler Energia Oy Sentnerikuja 2 00440 Helsinki / FI | [1996/35] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION FIN-29600 Noormarkku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Charles 3930 San Gregorioway San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 02 /
Kuivalainen, Reijo 4015 Porte La Paz, Apt. 1700 San Diego, CA 92122 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
Lee, Yam 11212 Conte Playa Azteca San Diego, CA 92124 / US | 04 /
Sellakumar, Karukkampalayam 10540 Kemerton Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119281.9 | 30.11.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | US19920982696 | 30.11.1992 Original published format: US 982696 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0600440 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0600440 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, B01D50/00, F23J15/00 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
B01D46/2429 (EP,US);
B01D46/62 (EP,US);
B01D46/24491 (EP,US);
B01D46/24492 (EP,US);
B01D46/2451 (US);
B01D46/2455 (EP,US);
B01D46/2476 (EP,US);
B01D46/2482 (EP,US);
B01D46/2484 (EP,US);
B01D46/2486 (US);
B01D53/508 (EP,US);
B01D53/8625 (EP,US);
B01D53/8631 (EP,US);
B01D53/8656 (EP,US);
F23J15/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Abgasen | [1994/23] | English: | Method and apparatus for cleaning flue gases | [1994/23] | French: | Méthode et appareil d'épuration des gaz d'échappement | [1994/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 07.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/32] | 21.03.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4781831 (GOLDSMITH ROBERT L [US]) [DA] 1,8,12-14; | [A]EP0412345 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8; | [A]US5089237 (SCHUSTER HANS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,8; | [A]US5108714 (IWATA KATSUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,8-11,17; | [A]DE3920844 (DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIEN- GESELLSCHAFT)[A] 1,8 |