EP0603611 - Masticating agent for rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHEIN-CHEMIE RHEINAU GmbH Düsseldorfer Strasse 23-27 68219 Mannheim / DE | [1998/14] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states RHEIN-CHEMIE RHEINAU GmbH Düsseldorfer Strasse 23-27 D-68219 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steger, Lothar, Dr. Am Perlacher Forst D-81545 München / DE | 02 /
Syrowatka, Horst Kranichstrasse 4 D-68782 Brühl / DE | 03 /
Schütte, Walter 160 Jericho Valley Drive New Town, PA 18940 / US | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Gremm, Joachim, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Gremm, Joachim, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119517.6 | 03.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | DE19924242499 | 16.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4242499 | [1994/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0603611 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603611 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/09, C08L21/00 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
C08C19/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/0091 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0091, C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/26] | Title | German: | Mastiziermittel für Kautschuk | [1994/26] | English: | Masticating agent for rubber | [1994/26] | French: | Agent de mastication four caoutchouc | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2177909 (RHEIN CHEMIE RHEINAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]DD86496 (P.HEIN ET AL.) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |