EP0600507 - 3-Azabicyclo(3.1.0.)hexane-2-one derivatives and Herbicidal Compositions Containing them as Herbicidally Active Ingredients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriyasu, Koichi 3-6-9, Midorigaoka Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Tomiya, Kanji 2978-2, Minamiyoshida Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Akieda, Hideyuki 2142, Tougaou Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Aoki, Harumichi 2142, Tougou Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Makoto 2142, Tougou Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 06 /
Iwasaki, Yasunaga 138-1-224, Machibo Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 07 /
Koda, Sadafumi 2225-1-34, Tougou Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119530.9 | 03.12.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | JP19920325433 | 04.12.1992 Original published format: JP 32543392 | JP19930015140 | 02.02.1993 Original published format: JP 1514093 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600507 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0600507 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/52, A01N43/38 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
A01N43/38 (EP,US);
C07D209/52 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1994/23] | Title | German: | 3-azabicyclo(3.1.0) hexan-2-on Derivate, und diese als Herbizid wirksame Bestandteile enthaltende Herbizide Zusammensetzungen | [1994/23] | English: | 3-Azabicyclo(3.1.0.)hexane-2-one derivatives and Herbicidal Compositions Containing them as Herbicidally Active Ingredients | [1994/23] | French: | Dérivés de 3-azabicyclo (3.1.0) hexan-a-one, et compositions herbicides les contenant en tant qu'agents à activité herbicide | [1994/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4118393 (FANSHAWE WILLIAM JOSEPH, et al); | [AD]US4196120 (CRAWLEY LANTZ S [US], et al); | [AD]US3745170 (FUJINAMI AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]EP0004107 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US4082849 (KAMEDA NOBUYUKI, et al) | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, 1985, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 11523u, 'Separation of diastereoisomeric amides by preparative HPLC and analysis of enantiomers by chromatography on a chiral support' page 342-343 ; |