EP0601495 - Resin composition for extruded forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1000, Kamoshida Oaba Yokohama 227 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Koji, c/o Mitsubishi Petro.Co., Ltd. Yokkaichi Research Center, 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi, Mie / JP | 02 /
Ikeno, Hajime, c/o Mitsubishi Petro.Co., Ltd. Yokkaichi Research Center, 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi, Mie / JP | 03 /
Shichijo, Keiko, c/o Mitsubishi Petro.Co., Ltd. Yokkaichi Research Center, 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi, Mie / JP | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119535.8 | 03.12.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | JP19920327015 | 07.12.1992 Original published format: JP 32701592 | JP19930027892 | 17.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2789293 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0601495 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0601495 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601495 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04, C08L23/16 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L2310/00 (EP,US);
C08L2314/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1994/24] | C08L23/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/24] | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung für extrudierte Formen | [1994/24] | English: | Resin composition for extruded forms | [1994/24] | French: | Composition à base de résine pour formes extrudées | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0359440 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-22 * page 2, line 43 - page 3, line 8; claim - * |