EP0602479 - Compensation device for an angle error between a cosinusoidal and a sinusoidal position dependant measurement signal in an angle or linear length sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuylen, Michael Kantstrasse 69 D-90513 Zirndorf / DE | [1994/25] | Application number, filing date | 93119538.2 | 03.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | DE19924242145 | 14.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4242145 | [1994/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0602479 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0602479 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/245, G01D5/244, G01D3/02, G01D5/34 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
G01D5/24476 (EP);
G01D5/2448 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/25] | G01D5/245 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausgleich eines Fehlwinkels zwischen einem cosinus- und einem sinusförmigen, lageabhängigen Messsignal bei einem Winkelgeber bzw. einem Linearmassstab | [1994/25] | English: | Compensation device for an angle error between a cosinusoidal and a sinusoidal position dependant measurement signal in an angle or linear length sensor | [1994/25] | French: | Dispositif de compensation pour l'erreur d'un angle entre un signal sinusoidal et cosinusoidal, dépendant de la position, pour un capteur d'angle ou de longueur linéaire | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/29] | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2137755 (COMPUTER MEMORIES INC) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4141000 (PAPST MOTOREN GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4025770 (TEKTRONIX INC) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0289414 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [A] 1 * abstract * |