blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0611724

EP0611724 - Guiding device for lifts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.12.1998
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.1999 [1999/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C. HAUSHAHN GmbH & Co.
Borsigstrasse 24
D-70469 Stuttgart / DE
[1994/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Biewald, Joachim, Dr.
Scheurenrain 10
D-71364 Winnenden/Degenhof / DE
02 / Scheub, Volker
Brettacher Weg 8
D-71334 Waiblingen / DE
03 / Holler, Helge
Kleiststrasse 13
D-75177 Pforzheim / DE
04 / Fenkl, Karl
Honoldweg 17
D-70193 Stuttgart 10 / DE
05 / Hugel, Stefan
Mühlbachweg 3
D-71409 Schwaikheim / DE
06 / Grosser, Martin
Jahnstrasse 67
D-71032 Böblingen / DE
07 / Schneider, Peter
Hirschländer Strasse 69/1
D-71254 Ditzingen / DE
08 / Barth, Wolfgang
Frimley Strasse 66
D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
09 / Moll, Hermann
Mörikestrasse 2
D-71554 Weissach im Tal / DE
10 / Pollmann, Horst
Blammerbergstrasse 81
D-71263 Weil der Stadt / DE
[1994/34]
Representative(s)Schmid, Berthold
Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/34]Schmid, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing.
Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
D-70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date93119750.308.12.1993
[1994/34]
Priority number, dateDE19930002119U15.02.1993         Original published format: DE 9302119 U
[1994/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0611724
Date:24.08.1994
Language:DE
[1994/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0611724
Date:28.01.1998
Language:DE
[1998/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.1994
ClassificationIPC:B66B7/02
[1994/34]
CPC:
B66B7/022 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1994/34]
TitleGerman:Führungsvorrichtung für Aufzüge[1994/34]
English:Guiding device for lifts[1994/34]
French:Dispositif de guidage pour ascenseurs[1994/34]
Examination procedure27.05.1994Examination requested  [1994/34]
13.06.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.07.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.1997Fee for grant paid
02.10.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2278975  (STAHL AUFZUEGE [DE]) [A] 1* figure - *;
 [A]US4324360  (SUN LU, et al) [A] 1 * column A * * figure - *;
 [A]CA1241676  (DAVIS LEONARD L) [A] 1 * figures 4,7; claims 1,2,5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.