EP0603679 - Siloxane block copolymer-modified thermoplastic polyurethanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/29] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pudleiner, Heinz, Dr. Bethelstrasse 16 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Hugl, Herbert, Dr. Gemarkenweg 9 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
Dhein, Rolf, Dr. Deswatinesstrasse 30 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Müller, Hanns-Peter, Dr. Hollweg 20 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | [1994/26] | Application number, filing date | 93119956.6 | 10.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | DE19924243799 | 23.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4243799 | [1994/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603679 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0603679 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603679 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/65, C08G18/61, C08G77/458, A61M25/00 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
C08G77/458 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/4009 (EP,US);
C08G18/61 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/26] | Title | German: | Siloxanblockcopolymer-modifizierte thermoplastische Polyurethane | [1994/26] | English: | Siloxane block copolymer-modified thermoplastic polyurethanes | [1994/26] | French: | Polyuréthanes thermoplastiques modifiés par des copolymères séquencés de siloxane | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 16.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63179916 ; | [A]EP0004939 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4* example 1; claims 1-3,6 *; | [X]EP0068385 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-6 * examples 1,2; claims 1-3,5-8 *; | [DX]GB2140438 (THORATEC LAB CORP) [DX] 1,3-5 * example 1; claims 1,2,4,6 *; | [X]EP0332065 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1,3-6 * page 4, line 30 - line 46; examples 1,2; claims 1,2,5,6 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881129), vol. 12, no. 455, Database accession no. (C - 548)<3302>, & JP63179916 A 00000000 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC.) [X] 1 * abstract * |