EP0603685 - Recording system for a singalong disc player [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takada, Shinichi, c/o Tokorozawa Koujou Pioneer Elec. Corp., 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Kasuya, Haruhiko, c/o Tokorozawa Koujou Pioneer Elec. Corp., 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Masaya, c/o Tokorozawa Koujou Pioneer Elec. Corp., 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/26] | Popp, Eugen, Dr. MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119994.7 | 10.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | JP19920333314 | 14.12.1992 Original published format: JP 33331492 | [1994/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603685 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0603685 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603685 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034, G11B7/00 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
G10H1/363 (EP,US);
G11B27/002 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/26] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungssystem für einen Karaoke-Plattenspieler | [1994/26] | English: | Recording system for a singalong disc player | [1994/26] | French: | Système d'enregistrement pour un lecteur de disque karaoke | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 11.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8501382 (STORAGE TECHNOLOGY PARTNERS [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]EP0072704 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 6 *; | [PA]JPH05216487 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931206), vol. 17, no. 658, Database accession no. (P - 1654), & JP05216487 A 19930827 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [PA] 1,2 * abstract * |