EP0610578 - Installation for coating by spraying powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITW Gema AG Mövenstrasse 17 9015 St. Gallen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states Gema Volstatic AG Mövenstrasse 17 CH-9015 St. Gallen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Bühlmann, Eugen Thomas Bachstrasse 80a CH-9202 Gossau / CH | 02 /
Gubler, Roland Mühlenweiherstrasse 4 CH-9030 Abtwil / CH | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1994/33] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter, Burgwalderstrasse 4A, Postfach 10 26 05 D-86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120105.7 | 14.12.1993 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | DE19934300837 | 14.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4300837 | [1994/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610578 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/12 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
B01D46/2407 (EP,US);
B01D46/0086 (EP);
B01D46/22 (EP);
B01D46/62 (EP);
B01D46/71 (EP);
B01D46/76 (EP);
B01D50/20 (EP);
B01J2/04 (EP);
B05B14/45 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1994/33] | Title | German: | Pulver-Sprühbeschichtungsanlage | [1994/33] | English: | Installation for coating by spraying powder | [1994/33] | French: | Installation de revêtement par pulvérisation de poudre | [1994/33] | File destroyed: | 13.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 24.03.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2181396 (RAPP HERBERT [DE]) [A] 7 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2262084 (ANDRASFALVY K) [A] 1-6 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 16 * * page 13, line 15 - page 14, line 12; figure - *; | [YD]DE2430517 (GEMA AG) [YD] 1-6 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]FR2277627 (ANDRASFALVY K [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 19; figure - *; | [AD]DE2546920 (GEMA AG) [AD] 8* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4277260 (BROWNING JESSE H) [A] 1-6 * column 7, line 4 - line 34; figure - *; | [Y]EP0141778 (RIBNITZ PETER) [Y] 1-6 * page 7, line 17 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9116141 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [A] 9 * page 29, line 9 - line 20; figure - * |