EP0593099 - Apparatus for inter-frame predictive encoding of video signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiyama, Kenji, c/o Daini Royaru Haitsu 305 8-5 Yanagisawa Noda-Shi Chiba-Ken / JP | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93120194.1 | 27.04.1990 | [1994/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890111301 | 28.04.1989 Original published format: JP 11130189 | [1994/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593099 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0593099 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/32 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
H04N19/90 (EP,US);
H04N19/152 (EP,US);
H04N19/503 (EP,US);
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/16] | H04N7/13, H04N7/137 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/16] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Zwischenbild-Vorhersagekodierung eines Videosignals | [1994/16] | English: | Apparatus for inter-frame predictive encoding of video signal | [1994/16] | French: | Dispositif de codage prédictif inter-image d'un signal vidéo | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90304640.7 / EP0396360 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.07.1996 | [2003/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4383272 (NETRAVALI ARUN N, et al); | [A]US4825285 (SPEIDEL JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * column W *; | [PA]US4887156 (OHKI JUNICHI [JP]) [PA] 1-4 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 38; figure 6 *; | [E]EP0396846 (RAI RADIOTELEVISIONE ITALIANA [IT]) [E] 1-4 * the whole document * |