EP0603734 - Steering stop for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoll, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Schwanenstrasse 22 D-64569 Nauheim / DE | 02 /
Glatzel, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Schlossgasse 18 D-55276 Oppenheim / DE | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Kümpfel, Heinz, et al Adam Opel AG, Patentwesen 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Kümpfel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Adam Opel AG, Patentwesen D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120241.0 | 16.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | DE19924243824 | 23.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4243824 | [1994/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0603734 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603734 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/00 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
B60G7/04 (EP);
B62D7/00 (EP);
B62D7/18 (EP);
B60G2200/44 (EP);
B60G2204/4502 (EP);
B60G2206/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1994/26] | Title | German: | Anschlagteil für eine Lenkachse eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1994/26] | English: | Steering stop for a motor vehicle | [1994/26] | French: | Butée de direction pour un véhicule automobile | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 22.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3736666 (ADAM OPEL) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |