EP0602675 - Gas purification process employing amine absorbent solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/25] | Process for converting heat stable amine salts to heat regenerable amine salts | ||
[1997/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roy, Veronique 924 Miville-Dechence, St. Vincent-de-Paul Laval, Quebec H7E 3A8 / CA | 02 /
Hakka, Leo Ernest 48 Browning Drive Dollard Des Ormeaux Quebec H9G 2K4 / CA | 03 /
Sarlis, Jean Ioannis 94 Jubinville, Pont-Viau Laval Quebec H7G 3E1 / CA | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/25] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120438.2 | 17.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | US19920993015 | 18.12.1992 Original published format: US 993015 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0602675 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0602675 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602675 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/14, B01D61/44, C07C209/68, C07C213/08, // B01D53/14 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
B01D53/1468 (EP,US);
B01D53/1425 (EP,US);
B01D61/44 (EP,US);
C07C209/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/25] | C01B21/14, B01D61/44, // B01D53/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Gasen mittels aminhaltiger Absorptionslössungen | [1997/32] | English: | Gas purification process employing amine absorbent solutions | [1997/32] | French: | Procédé de purification de gaz à l'aide de solutions d'amine absorbantes | [1997/32] |
Former [1994/25] | Verfahren zur Umwandlung von hitzestabilen Aminsalzen in Wärmeregenerierbaren Aminsalzen | ||
Former [1994/25] | Process for converting heat stable amine salts to heat regenerable amine salts | ||
Former [1994/25] | Procédé de conversion de sels d'amines stables à la chaleur en sels d'amines régénérables par la chaleur | Examination procedure | 18.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.08.1997 | DK | 06.08.1997 | GR | 06.08.1997 | LI | 06.08.1997 | SE | 06.11.1997 | PT | 12.11.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/30] | CH | 06.08.1997 | |
DK | 06.08.1997 | ||
LI | 06.08.1997 | ||
SE | 06.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | CH | 06.08.1997 | |
LI | 06.08.1997 | ||
SE | 06.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | CH | 06.08.1997 | |
LI | 06.08.1997 | ||
SE | 06.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 06.08.1997 | |
LI | 06.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU707590 ; | [A]US2768945 (ABRAHAM SHAPIRO) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 48 ** column 5, line 9 *; | [A]US3554691 (KUO WEN LING, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 5 * * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 40 * * column 7, line 23 - line 39 * * column 10, line 49 - line 69 *; | [XA]FR2243904 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-4,10 * figure -; claims 1-5 * * page 1, line 1 - line 25 * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 37 * [A] 5-9; | [A]EP0286143 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6,9 * abstract * * page 1; example 1 * * page 13, line 31 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0326427 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 35 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 34, Database accession no. 80-59935C, & SU707590 A 19800108 (KUBAN UNIV) [A] 1 * abstract * |