EP0603810 - Lighting device for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Shinichi 1-22-27, Shinsaku, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nagasawa, Satoshi 1-21-14, Hikawadai, Higashi kurume-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ishikawa, Takeshi 5-17-10, Todoroki, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al Patentanwälte Bauer Hubbuch, Twelmeier Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Rudolf Bauer Dipl.-Ing.Helmut Hubbuch, Dipl.Phys. Ulrich Twelmeier Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120570.2 | 21.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | JP19920092114 | 21.12.1992 Original published format: JP 9211492 | [1994/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0603810 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603810 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/28, B60Q1/00 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
B60Q1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/26] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung für Fahrzeuge | [1994/26] | English: | Lighting device for vehicle | [1994/26] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage pour véhicule | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4849861 (ARIMA YOSHIHARU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 43 - line 52; figure 1 * * column 3, line 55 - line 67 * * column 4, line 15 - line 32 * * column 4, line 48 - line 56 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]GB2242014 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 11 - line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]US4912606 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 52 - line 65; figure 3 * |