EP0607596 - Angle measuring method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirotsune, Satoshi 3-4-21-508, Hitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka-fu 566 / JP | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120578.5 | 21.12.1993 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | JP19930006400 | 19.01.1993 Original published format: JP 640093 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0607596 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0607596 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607596 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/74, G01B11/26 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
G01B11/26 (EP,US);
H04N9/3185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/30] | Title | German: | Winkelmessverfahren und -gerät | [1994/30] | English: | Angle measuring method and apparatus | [1994/30] | French: | Méthode et appareil de mesure d'angle | [1994/30] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 27.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH043042 ; | [XA]JPH0442679 ; | [A]EP0460947 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 1 - line 30; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4721386 (COLLYER PHILIP W [US]) | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920413), vol. 16, no. 147, Database accession no. (P - 1336), & JP04003042 A 19920108 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 11-16 * abstract * [A] 1-10 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900608), vol. 16, no. 227, Database accession no. (E - 1207), & JP04042679 A 19920213 (SONY CORP) [X] 11-16 * abstract * [A] 1-10 |