EP0604880 - Apparatus and method for automatically receiving and dispensing banknotes and valuables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.I.B. ELETTRONICA S.R.L. Via Liberazione, 65/13 I-20068 Peschiera Borromeo (Milano) / IT | [1994/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fumanelli Giuseppe Ezio Via Prealpi, 3 I-20066 Melzo (Milan) / IT | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Lunati, Vittoriano Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.l. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | Lunati, Vittoriano LUNATI & MAZZONI S.a.s. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93120594.2 | 21.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI02991 | 30.12.1992 Original published format: IT MI922991 | [1994/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0604880 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0604880 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G07D1/00 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
B65H31/24 (EP,US);
G07D11/12 (EP,US);
B65H2405/352 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/27] | G07D13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum automatischen Annehmen und Ausgeben von Banknoten und Wertgegenständen | [1994/27] | English: | Apparatus and method for automatically receiving and dispensing banknotes and valuables | [1994/27] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour automatiquement recevoir et distribuer des billets de banque et des objets de valeur | [1994/27] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/39] | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2079019 (BOSINGER GERHARD, et al) [X] 1,2,12 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0182137 (AUTELCA AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0379638 (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH]) [A] 1-14* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0385650 (DE LA RUE SYST [GB]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 1 * |