EP0607609 - Process for mixing and injecting a two-components adhesive in a frame corner mechanically stabilised by a L or T-like joining element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1-15 D-33609 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Habicht, Siegfried Marderweg 7a D-33818 Leopoldshöhe / DE | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120898.7 | 24.12.1993 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | DE19934301127 | 18.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4301127 | [1994/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0607609 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0607609 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32, B05C17/005, B05C17/01, B01F13/00, B05D5/10, F16B11/00 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
F16B11/006 (EP);
B01F31/55 (EP);
B01F33/5011 (EP);
B01F35/713 (EP);
B01F35/7131 (EP);
B01F35/7161 (EP);
B05C17/00553 (EP);
B05C17/00583 (EP);
B05C17/01 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1994/30] | B65D81/32, B05C17/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Mischen und Einspritzen eines Zweikomponentenklebers in eine durcheinen Eck- oder einen T-Verbinder mechanisch stabilisierte Rahmenecke | [1994/30] | English: | Process for mixing and injecting a two-components adhesive in a frame corner mechanically stabilised by a L or T-like joining element | [1994/30] | French: | Procédé pour mélanger et injecter une colle bicomposante dans un coin d'armature stabilisé mécaniquement par un élément de liaison en L ou en T | [1994/30] | File destroyed: | 10.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.09.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0377287 (VICK STEVE LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * column 3, line 6 - line 53; figures 1-3 * [A] 2; | [A]DE3835180 (SCHNEIDER FRIEDHELM [DE]); | [A]US4735509 (RAUSCH PAUL G [US]); | [A]DE9116065U (SCHIEFERDECKER GMBH & CO KG) | [DA] - A. MATTING UND G. HENNING, "Das Kleben von Bauteilen aus Aluminium in der Praxis des In- und Auslandes", ZEITSCHRIFT "ALUMINIUM", 42. JAHRGANG, pages 697 - 701 |