EP0554940 - Electromagnetic lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chen, Mavis No. 8-1, Alley 106, Lane 423, Wann Ta Road Taipei / TW | [1993/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Trenité van Doorne De Lairessestraat 133 Postbus 75265 NL-1070 AG Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 93200201.7 | 27.01.1993 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | US19920829255 | 03.02.1992 Original published format: US 829255 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554940 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
E05C19/166 (EP,US);
Y10S292/53 (EP,US);
Y10T292/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/32] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Schloss | [1993/32] | English: | Electromagnetic lock | [1993/32] | French: | Système de serrure électromagnétique | [1993/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/49] | 09.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2543603 (CHALUS CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [X]FR2607545 (BRUNE JEAN PIERRE [FR]); | [A]FR2649151 (DEI LIERRE SARL [FR]) |