EP0543802 - Process for preparing a cerium oxide with high specific surface area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/21] | A method for making automotive exhaust catalysts | ||
[1995/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bedford, Raymond Earl 6168 Golfview Drive Burton, MI 48509 / US | 02 /
Labarge, William John 306 South Erie Bay City, MI 48706 / US | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | ||
Former [1993/21] | Haines, Arthur Donald Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93200227.2 | 17.05.1991 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | US19900534584 | 06.06.1990 Original published format: US 534584 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0543802 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0543802 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0543802 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/10, B01J23/76, B01J37/02, B01D53/94 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J23/83 (EP,US);
B01J23/835 (EP,US);
B01J23/84 (EP,US);
B01J23/868 (EP,US);
B01J23/8892 (EP,US);
B01J37/0215 (EP,US);
B01J37/0219 (EP,US);
B01J37/0242 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/21] | B01J23/10, B01J23/76, B01J37/02, B01D53/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Ceroxid mit hoher spezifischer Oberfläche | [1995/10] | English: | Process for preparing a cerium oxide with high specific surface area | [1995/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un oxyde de cérium à haute surface spécifique | [1995/10] |
Former [1993/21] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Katalysators für Kraftwagenabgase | ||
Former [1993/21] | A method for making automotive exhaust catalysts | ||
Former [1993/21] | Méthode de préparation de catalyseurs pour des gaz d'échappement d'automobile | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91201205.1 / EP0460730 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.03.1995 | GB | 08.06.1995 | DE | 09.06.1995 | [2015/21] |
Former [1996/30] | GB | 08.06.1995 | |
DE | 09.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | DE | 09.06.1995 | |
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | DE | 09.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0153227 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]); | [A]EP0251708 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]); | [A]WO8907005 (TI CORPORATE SERVICES [GB]) |